GA SB221 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to ethics in government, so as to provide for a definition; to provide for leadership committees; to provide for chairpersons; to provide that such committees may receive contributions and make expenditures; to provide for disposition of assets in certain circumstances; to provide for filings and reports; to provide an exception from contribution limits; to provide for certain notices; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics in Government; leadership committees; chairpersons; such committees may receive contributions and make expenditures; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #270 (Y: 96 N: 69 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #90 (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 21st: Senate Vote #89 (Y: 5 N: 43 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-04 Act 219
2021-05-04SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-03-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2021-02-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-22SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback