GA SB220 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Effective Date 2022-04-28
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Effective Date 2022-04-28
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education accountability assessment programs, so as to create the Georgia Commission on Civics Education; to provide for membership, filling of vacancies, terms, officers, duties, meetings, and reimbursement of members of the commission; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative intent; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"The Georgia Civics Renewal Act"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #868 (Y: 48 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Am As Am: House Vote #865 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #370 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #323 (Y: 159 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #135 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - Agree To Senate Am As Am: House Vote #865 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #370 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #323 (Y: 159 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #135 (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Effective Date 2022-04-28 | |
2022-04-28 | Act 723 | |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub As Amended |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |