GA SB213 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Act 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Act 23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 66 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to zoning procedures, so as to prohibit local governments from preventing the continuance of lawful nonconforming use of property when a preexisting manufactured home or mobile home is replaced with another such home; to provide for exceptions; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Zoning Procedures; local governments from preventing the continuance of lawful nonconforming use of property; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Russ Goodman [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] |
Sen. Clint Dixon [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #268 (Y: 169 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #193 (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #193 (Y: 45 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Act 23 | |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |