GA SB211 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 19-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-13 - Effective Date 2023-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to education, so as to establish the Georgia Council on Literacy; to provide for consultation with subject matter experts; to provide for automatic repeal; to require local school systems to develop and implement five-year literacy plans for such school system and individual literacy plans for students in kindergarten through grade five; to replace the Education Coordinating Council with the Alliance of Education Agency Heads; to provide for related matters; to make conforming changes; to provide for legislative findings; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Council on Literacy; establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #307 (Y: 175 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #333 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #145 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #333 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #145 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Effective Date 2023-07-01 | |
2023-04-13 | Act 8 | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |