GA SB210 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for definitions relative to registration and licensing of motor vehicles; to provide for certain exceptions to the issuance of license plates, application for motor vehicle registration, and the design and display of license plates and revalidation decals; to provide for procedures, conditions, and standards for the issuance and display of digital license plates on motor vehicles; to provide for duties and rights of digital license plate providers; to authorize the adoption of rules and regulations by the Department of Revenue in relation to such license plates and providers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles and Traffic; definitions relative to registration and licensing of motor vehicles; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #265 (Y: 113 N: 47 NV: 7 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #142 (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #142 (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 134 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |