GA SB206 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to provide for a short title and findings; to require health plans to provide coverage for hearing aids for certain individuals; to provide for the frequency of replacing hearing aids; to provide for coverage of services and supplies; to provide options for higher priced devices; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Hearing Aid Coverage for Children Act'
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #284 (Y: 155 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #161 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Vote #284 (Y: 155 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #161 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 174 | |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |