GA SB203 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Secretary of State, so as create the Georgia World War I Centennial Commission; to provide for the membership, powers and duties, expense reimbursement, and operations of the commission; to provide for administrative assignment of the commission to the office of the Secretary of State and legal services by the Attorney General; to provide for the purpose of the commission; to authorize the solicitation, receipt, and expenditure of appropriations and donations; to provide for reports; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia World War I Centennial Commission; create; membership, powers, and duties
Sponsors
Sen. Hunter Hill [R] | Rep. John Yates [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #393 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #390 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #138 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #390 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #138 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-05 | Act 71 | |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Senate Hopper |