GA SB196 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 24-2)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-02 - Senate Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 4 of Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to horns, exhaust systems, mirrors, windshields, tires, safety belts, and energy absorption systems, so as to provide for the failure to wear a safety belt or safety restraints for children as admissible evidence in civil actions; to provide for legislative declaration and intent; to prohibit the failure to wear a safety belt or safety restraints for children as a basis for cancellation of insurance coverage; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Safety Belts; failure to wear safety restraints for children as admissible evidence in civil actions; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #119 (Y: 24 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Lost |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |