GA SB183 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to animals, so as to provide for liability protection for certain activities related to livestock; to provide for limitations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Animals; provide for liability protection for certain activities related to livestock; limitations
Sponsors
Sen. John Wilkinson [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Rep. Regina Quick [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #120 (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |