GA SB182 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the creation of one or more community improvement districts in Newton County and in each municipality therein; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Newton County Community Improvement Districts Act"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #98 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #98 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V10 | |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |