GA SB181 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-28 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 1-4-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to American History Month and Georgia History Month, so as to declare September of each year to be Georgia History Month; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia History Month; declare September of each year
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Ronnie Chance [R] | Sen. Stephen Thompson [D] | Sen. Cecil Staton [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - House - House Vote #433 (Y: 47 N: 117 NV: 13 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #115 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #115 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2013-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-26 | House | House Postponed |
2013-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |