GA SB18 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 7 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to kinds of insurance, limits of risks, and reinsurance, so as to provide definitions; to provide that direct primary care agreements are not insurance; to exempt such agreements from regulation as insurance; to provide for discontinuance of services under certain circumstances; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Direct Primary Care Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Vote #237 (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #61 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01 Effective Date
2019-04-25 Act 47
2019-04-25SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2019-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-20SenateSenate Recommitted
2019-02-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback