GA SB17 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to public utilities and public transportation, so as to specifically authorize telephone cooperatives and their broadband affiliates to provide broadband services; to provide for definitions; to authorize certain financing and partnerships for the provision of broadband services; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Utilities and Public Transportation; authorize telephone cooperatives and their broadband affiliates; provide broadband services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #35 (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-02-20SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-14SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-13SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback