GA SB163 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 14 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to other educational programs under the "Quality Basic Education Act," so as to authorize home study students to participate in extracurricular and interscholastic activities in the student's resident public school system; to provide for definitions; to provide eligibility requirements; to prohibit certain limitations by resident school systems, public schools, and athletic associations with respect to home study students participating in extracurricular and interscholastic activities; to provide for participation at a particular public school; to provide for participation fees; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Tim Tebow Act" or "Equal Opportunity for Access in Education Act"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #162 (Y: 23 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #163 (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-22SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback