GA SB162 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-6-391 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to driving under the influence of alcohol, drugs, or other intoxicating substances, penalties, publication of notice of conviction for persons convicted for the second time, and endangering a child, so as to provide that driving under the influence of alcohol or drugs by a person who is an illegal alien is a felony; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rules of the Road; provide driving under influence of alcohol/drugs by illegal alien is a felony
Sponsors
Sen. John Crosby [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. William Ligon [R] |
Sen. Barry Loudermilk [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #109 - Passage (Y: 35 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #108 - Motion To Table (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #108 - Motion To Table (Y: 20 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-11 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-08 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-28 | Senate Read and Referred |