GA SB152 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the state and other flags, so as to add language to the pledge of allegiance to the state flag; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State and Other Flags; pledge of allegiance to the state flag; add language
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #787 (Y: 125 N: 23 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #145 (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #145 (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 788 | |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |