GA SB150 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the sale of alcoholic beverages at publicly owned facilities, so as to provide for the sale of distilled spirits at public golf courses; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages; provide for the sale of distilled spirits at public golf courses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #131 - Passage By Substitute (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #130 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By Senator From The 18th To Committee Sub (Y: 12 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #130 - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By Senator From The 18th To Committee Sub (Y: 12 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-31 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-04 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Read and Referred |