GA SB148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nonprofit corporations, so as to allow for a nonprofit corporation organized in a foreign jurisdiction to change its jurisdiction of organization to this state; to allow for a nonprofit corporation organized in this state to change its jurisdiction of organization to a foreign jurisdiction; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonprofit Corporations; organized in foreign jurisdiction to change its jurisdiction or organization to this state; allow

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-09SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback