GA SB148 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to nonprofit corporations, so as to allow for a nonprofit corporation organized in a foreign jurisdiction to change its jurisdiction of organization to this state; to allow for a nonprofit corporation organized in this state to change its jurisdiction of organization to a foreign jurisdiction; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Nonprofit Corporations; organized in foreign jurisdiction to change its jurisdiction or organization to this state; allow
Sponsors
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Rick Jeffares [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50427 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/164864 |