GA SB142 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-29 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to lottery for education, so as to provide for the lottery game of sports wagering in this state; to provide for and revise certain definitions; to provide for oversight of such lottery game by the Georgia Lottery Corporation and its board of directors; to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the O.C.G.A., relating to sales and use taxes, so as to exempt wagers placed as part of the lottery game of sports wagering; to provide for violations and penalties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Lottery for Education; lottery game of sports wagering in this state; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Harold Jones [D] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Valencia Seay [D] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of The Amendment By The Sen From The 5th As Amended: Senate Vote #133 (Y: 24 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2a By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #132 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #134 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2a By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #132 (Y: 37 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #134 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Senate Hopper |