GA SB137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 11 of Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Child Support Recovery Act, so as to require the obligor to pay the full fee required by the federal Deficit Reduction Act of 2005; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child Support Recovery Act; federal Deficit Reduction Act of 2005; require the obligor to pay the full fee

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #333 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #338 (Y: 159 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #85 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 242
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-10SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-08SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback