GA SB130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 15-11-103 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the right to an attorney, so as to clarify provisions relating to the waiver of the right to counsel; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Right To An Attorney; waiver of the right to counsel; provisions; clarify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #389 (Y: 22 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #366 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #106 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-17SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback