GA SB13 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-5-1 and Chapter 10 of Title 17 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to murder and felony murder and sentencing and punishment, respectively, so as to provide for the imposition of life without parole of persons convicted of murder independently of a death penalty prosecution; to provide that the sentence of life without parole may be imposed without the necessity of the trier of fact making a recommendation of such sentence or finding statutory aggravating circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes; provide the imposition of life without parole; person convicted of murder independently of a death penalty prosecution
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Bill Hamrick [R] | Sen. Kasim Reed [D] | Sen. Preston Smith [R] |
Sen. Ed Tarver [D] | Sen. John Wiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #283 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #328 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #14 - Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2009-03-25 - House - House Vote #328 - Pass (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2009-02-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #14 - Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Effective Date | |
2009-04-29 | Act 62 | |
2009-04-29 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-13 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-26 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2009-03-25 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2009-03-25 | House Third Readers | |
2009-03-17 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-02-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-02-05 | House Second Readers | |
2009-02-04 | House First Readers | |
2009-02-03 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2009-02-03 | Senate Third Read | |
2009-01-28 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2009-01-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-14 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2008-12-12 | Senate Prefile |