GA SB127 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 468
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 17-17-15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the failure to provide notice not rendering responsible person liable or comprising a basis for error, the chapter not conferring standing, existing rights not affected, and waiver of rights by victim, so as to allow a victim to file a motion in a criminal case to assert his or her rights; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Failure to Provide Notice Not Rendering Responsible Person Liable; victim to file a motion in a criminal case to assert his or her rights; allow

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #765 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #768 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #153 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 468
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-07SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback