GA SB123 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to waste management, so as to eliminate the coal ash surcharge imposed by host local governments regarding municipal solid waste disposal facilities operated by private enterprise; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Waste Management; the coal ash surcharge imposed by host local governments; eliminate
Sponsors
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] |
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #726 (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #697 (Y: 142 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #697 (Y: 142 N: 15 NV: 6 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #478 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 376 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2020-06-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |