GA SB118 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to insurance generally, so as to modernize the Georgia Telemedicine Act; to rename the Telemedicine Act the Telehealth Act; to revise the definition of telemedicine; to provide a definition of telehealth; to prohibit insurers from requiring insureds to use telemedicine; to provide for pay equity for health care providers using telemedicine; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Insurance; Georgia Telemedicine Act; modernize; Telemedicine Act the Telehealth Act; rename
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] |
Sen. Gregory Kirk [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] | Rep. Darlene Taylor [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #308 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #64 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Vote #306 (Y: 168 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #64 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-06 | Act 155 | |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |