GA SB11 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-07 - Veto V5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to water resources, so as to reestablish the Georgia Geospatial Advisory Council and provide for its membership; to provide for definitions; to provide legislative intent; to provide for duties; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Geospatial Advisory Council; reestablish; membership; duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #388 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #327 (Y: 142 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - House - House Vote #327 (Y: 142 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #43 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Veto V5 | |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub |
2013-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Senate Prefile |