GA SB108 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum, so as to require courses in computer science in middle school and high school; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to provide for a phase-in of such requirement; to provide for courses through the Georgia Virtual School; to provide for grants for professional development programs for teachers providing instruction in computer science courses and content; to provide for annual reporting; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Competencies and Core Curriculum; computer science in middle school and high school; require
Sponsors
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Rep. Todd Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - House - House Vote #342 (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #354 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #150 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #354 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #150 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-02 | Act 135 | |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |