GA SB10 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Act 513
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Act 513
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 and Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to offenses against public order and motor vehicles and traffic, respectively, so as to provide for an offense of knowingly attending and facilitating an illegal drag race or a laying drags exhibition; to provide for punishment; to provide for offenses which disqualify certain drivers from obtaining a Class C or D driver's license; to increase the punishment for the offenses of reckless stunt driving; to provide for minimum periods of imprisonment for such offenses in certain instances; to provide for motor vehicle forfeiture in certain instances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Offenses Against Public Order And Motor Vehicles and Traffic; knowingly attending and facilitating an illegal drag race or a laying drags exhibition; punishment; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #832 (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #787 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #553 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #787 (Y: 149 N: 7 NV: 8 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #553 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Act 513 | |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2024-03-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-03-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |