GA HR940 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging Georgia to host the world's largest startup pitch competition; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia; host the world's largest startup pitch competition; encourage
Sponsors
Rep. Dar'shun Kendrick [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Roger Bruce [D] |
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Doreen Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2018-01-25 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/52219 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/171610 |