GA HR862 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing March 31, 2015, as César E. Chávez Day at the state capitol and honoring Mr. Chavez's birthday; and for other purposes.
Title
Cesar E. Chavez Day at the state capitol; March 31, 2015; recognize
Sponsors
Rep. Pedro Marin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-31 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/45078 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/152925 |