GA HR77 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-26 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-26 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION supporting the creation of a state veterans cemetery in Augusta-Richmond County, Georgia; and for other purposes.
Title
State veterans cemetery; Augusta-Richmond County; support creation
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Sheila Nelson [D] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] |
Rep. Barry Fleming [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - Adopt: House Vote #118 (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-02 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59260 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/196604 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59260#18260 |