GA HR72 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION encouraging Georgia to host the world's largest startup pitch competition; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia; host world's largest startup pitch competition; encourage

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-29HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback