GA HR625 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION encouraging the State of Georgia to establish a Georgia Gullah Geechee Heritage Society; and for other purposes.
Title
State of Georgia; establish Georgia Gullah Geechee Heritage Society; encourage
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Adopt: House Vote #815 (Y: 164 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-26 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61349 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/203964 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61349#19667 |