GA HR4 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-02 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize any municipality in the State of Georgia to establish by local law an independent school system; to provide definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Municipalities; establish by local law an independent school system; authorize - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Taylor [R] | Rep. Mike Dudgeon [R] | Rep. Mike Jacobs [R] | Rep. Joe Wilkinson [R] |
Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Valerie Clark [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-09 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-04 | House | House Hopper |
2015-01-02 | House | House Prefiled |