GA HR326 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing Mr. Roger C. Dill and dedicating a building in his honor; and for other purposes.
Title
Roger C. Dill Transportation Center; Tift County; dedicate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #654 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Vote #451 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Vote #451 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 599 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-02-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-02-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-25 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-22 | House | House Hopper |