GA HR25 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-03 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the President and Congress of the United States to support legislative efforts to reduce America's dependence on foreign oil; and for other purposes.
Title
President and United States Congress; urged to support legislative efforts to reduce America's foreign oil dependence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-03 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2009-03-05 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2009-01-15 | House Second Readers | |
2009-01-14 | House First Readers |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/25969 |
Text | http://www1.legis.ga.gov/legis/2009_10/versions/hr25_LC_94_0084_a_2.htm |