GA HR24 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION compensating Dominic Brian Lucci; and for other purposes.
Title
Lucci, Dominic Brian; compensate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Adoption: Senate Vote #276 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Shall The Ruling Of The Chair Be Sustained: Senate Vote #275 (Y: 29 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Adopt: House Vote #202 (Y: 154 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Shall The Ruling Of The Chair Be Sustained: Senate Vote #275 (Y: 29 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Adopt: House Vote #202 (Y: 154 N: 12 NV: 9 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-05-10 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 293 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-14 | House | House Hopper |