GA HR186 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to authorize the General Assembly to provide by law for pari-mutuel wagering on horse racing; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Horse racing; pari-mutuel wagering; provide - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. Harry Geisinger [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Ralph Long [D] |
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-02-10 | House Second Readers | |
2011-02-09 | House First Readers |