GA HR1655 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-18 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION requesting that Congress protect and defend the Constitution of the United States and expressing the State of Georgia's commitment to protecting the rights of our citizens against any attempt to curtail those rights; and for other purposes.
Title
Congress; protect and defend the Constitution of the United States; request
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Edward Lindsey [R] | Rep. Michael Caldwell [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Rep. Regina Quick [R] | Rep. Bruce Williamson [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote #784 (Y: 110 N: 53 NV: 12 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2014-03-04 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/42078 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20132014/142289 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/42078#11937 |