GA HR158 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION authorizing the granting of nonexclusive easements for the construction, installation, operation, and maintenance of facilities, utilities, roads, and ingresses and egresses in, on, over, under, upon, across, or through property owned by the State of Georgia in Calhoun, Camden, Chatham, Clarke, Coffee, DeKalb, Emanuel, Fulton, Jeff Davis, Monroe, Morgan, Polk, Tattnall, Towns, and Washington counties; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws, and for other purposes.
Title
Property; granting of nonexclusive easements; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Kenneth Vance [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] | Rep. Emory Dunahoo [R] |
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #358 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #206 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Adopt: House Vote #61 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Adoption By Substitute: Senate Vote #206 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - House - Adopt: House Vote #61 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Effective Date 2023-05-01 | |
2023-05-01 | Act 72 | |
2023-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-09 | House | House Hopper |