GA HR1523 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-10 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the Joint Study Committee to Review and Recommend Necessary Changes to the Georgia Code of Military Justice; and for other purposes.
Title
Joint Study Committee to Review and Recommend Necessary Changes to the Georgia Code of Military Justice; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Vote #727 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-21 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-20 | House | House Hopper |