GA HR1470 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION recognizing Jerusalem as the capital of Israel and urging the President of the United States to relocate the United States Embassy to Israel's capital; and for other purposes.
Title
President of the United States; relocate United States Embassy to Israel's capital of Jerusalem; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Micah Gravley [R] | Rep. David Ralston [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] | Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] |
Rep. Christian Coomer [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #720 (Y: 117 N: 43 NV: 15 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53541 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/176112 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53541#16049 |