GA HR1435 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Hotel-Motel Tax and a citizens advisory council for such committee; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Hotel-Motel Tax; create
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-21 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-08 | House Second Readers | |
2010-02-18 | House First Readers |