GA HR1432 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Disaster Mitigation and Resilience Study Committee; and for other purposes.
Title
House Disaster Mitigation and Resilience Study Committee; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt: House Vote #854 (Y: 152 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2024-03-11 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68768 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/226898 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/68768#24589 |