GA HR1416 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Bail Reform; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

House Study Committee on Bail Reform; create

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2018-03-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback