GA HR1292 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-19 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the Georgia Alzheimer's and Related Dementia Advisory Council and its work groups to study providing access to quality long-term care for individuals with Alzheimer's disease or other related dementia; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Alzheimer's and Related Dementia Advisory Council; study providing access to quality long-term care for individuals with Alzheimer's; urge
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Demetrius Douglas [D] |
Rep. Betty Price [R] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #723 (Y: 170 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-21 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53198 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/174583 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/53198#16052 |