GA HR1269 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION creating the House Study Committee on Local Law Enforcement Retirement; and for other purposes.
Title
House Study Committee on Local Law Enforcement Retirement; create
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Tanner [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Tommy Benton [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] | Rep. Steve Tarvin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-25 | House | House Hopper |