GA HR1229 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - House Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A RESOLUTION urging the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to provide for additional resources to address elder care, nursing home access, and expanded disabled residential programs for veteran community populations; and for other purposes.
Title
United States Department of Veterans Affairs; additional resources for elder care, nursing home access, and expanded disabled residential programs; urge; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Gladney [D] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Karen Mathiak [R] |
Rep. Charles Cannon [R] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - House - Adopt: House Vote #851 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-27 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2024-02-22 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67367 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20232024/225195 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/67367#24560 |