GA HR1150 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A RESOLUTION proposing an amendment to the Constitution so as to provide that the sales and use tax for educational purposes shall only be distributed on the basis of full-time equivalent student counts when proceeds are distributed between a county school district and the independent school districts located in such county; to provide for the submission of this amendment for ratification or rejection; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; educational purposes; only distributed on basis of full-time equivalent student counts - CA
Sponsors
Rep. Stacey Abrams [D] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Brooks Coleman [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] |
Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Margaret Kaiser [D] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - House Vote #831 - Agree Sen Sub As Am (Y: 163 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #829 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #796 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #735 - Motion To Engross (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #598 - Adopt (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #829 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 40 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #796 - Adoption Of Constitutional Amendment By Substitute (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #735 - Motion To Engross (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Vote #598 - Adopt (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Senate Disagrees House Amend/Sub | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Taken from Table | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Tabled | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Reconsidered | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Notice to Reconsider | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read Lost | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Engrossed | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-05 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-24 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-02-02 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-01-25 | House Withdrawn, Recommitted | |
2012-01-25 | House Second Readers | |
2012-01-24 | House First Readers |